EP0082218 - Holder for surgical sutures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1987 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intermedicat GmbH Gerliswilstrasse 43 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states INTERMEDICAT GMBH Gerliswilstrasse 43 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ploch, Horst Am Sportplatz 1 D-3509 Elfershausen / DE | 02 /
Heinemann, Dieter Birkenweg 6 D-3508 Melsungen-Röhrenfurth / DE | 03 /
Meil, Gerhard Guntershäuser Strasse 28 D-3501 Fuldabrück / DE | [1983/26] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1983/26] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110745.7 | 23.12.1981 | [1983/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082218 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082218 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/06133 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/26] | Title | German: | Trägervorrichtung für chirurgisches Nahtmaterial | [1983/26] | English: | Holder for surgical sutures | [1983/26] | French: | Support pour sutures chirurgicales | [1983/26] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 11.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2499890 (EDWARD THEMAK); | [A]CH344183 (SUTAG S A [CH]); | [A]CH448376 (PFRIMMER & CO J [DE]); | [A]DE2618662 (STEFFAN WOLFGANG, et al); | [A]US4287987 (HOFFMAN LUTHER A, et al) | Examination | DE2700077 |