EP0032766 - Method of rolling a length of metal bar or wire and apparatus for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOGOVENS GROEP B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [1983/19] |
Former [1981/30] | For all designated states ESTEL HOOGOVENS B.V. Kesslerplein 2 IJmuiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferket, Florimond Abelenlaan 15 Oudorp / NL | 02 /
Kuenen, Cornelis Anthonius Junolaan 2 Heerhugowaard / NL | [1981/30] | Representative(s) | van Buytene, Arie Jacobus, et al p/a Hoogovens Groep B.V. P.O.Box 10.000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/30] | van Buytene, Arie Jacobus, et al p/a Hoogovens Groep B.V. P.O.Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200028.9 | 12.01.1981 | [1981/30] | Priority number, date | NL19800000356 | 21.01.1980 Original published format: NL 8000356 | [1981/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032766 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032766 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B21B39/00, // B21B45/02, B21B33/00, B21B1/18 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
B21B39/006 (EP);
B21B1/18 (EP);
B21B2033/005 (EP);
B21B2273/08 (EP);
B21B39/08 (EP);
B21B45/0224 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU [1981/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Walzen von Metallstäben und -draht und Apparat zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1984/14] | English: | Method of rolling a length of metal bar or wire and apparatus for carrying out the method | [1981/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour laminer des longueurs de barres ou de fils métalliques | [1981/30] |
Former [1981/30] | Verfahren zum Walzen der Länge von Metallstäben und -draht und Apparat zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | Examination procedure | 12.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/30] | 20.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | NL7414028 [ ] (HOOGOVENS IJMUIDEN BV) | [ ] - METALLURGIST, Vol. 20, No. 5/6, May/June 1976, pages 416-417 New York, U.S.A. V.E. BELENKOV: "Auxiliary feeder for a wire coiler". | Examination | NL154129C | US2756169 | DE967071 | GB932587 | GB1162859 | FR2004405 | DE2539422 | BE846615R | FR2389436 |