EP0037128 - Gutter outlet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.06.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1986 | Opposition rejected | published on 30.07.1986 [1986/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHEINZINK GMBH Postfach 1452 45705 Datteln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states RHEINZINK GMBH Bahnhofstrasse 90 Postfach 1452 D-45705 Datteln / DE | ||
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states Rheinisches Zinkwalzwerk GMBH & Co. KG Bahnhofstrasse 90 D-4354 Datteln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmrich, Peter Kreuzstrasse 333 D-4370 Marl / DE | 02 /
Marx, Hans Ricarda-Huch-Strasse 49 D-4370 Marl / DE | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Ernst (DE) Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | Fischer, Ernst, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 81200114.7 | 30.01.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | DE19803012033 | 28.03.1980 Original published format: DE 3012033 | [1981/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037128 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037128 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/06 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
E04D13/068 (EP);
E04D13/0645 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, LU, NL [1981/40] | Title | German: | Rinneneinhängstutzen | [1983/47] | English: | Gutter outlet | [1981/40] | French: | Dégorgement pour gouttière | [1981/40] |
Former [1981/40] | Rinnenstutzen | Examination procedure | 31.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 03.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.1984
25.07.1984
ADMISSIBLE Rösle Metallwarenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 226 D-8952 Marktoberdorf / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann, Heinrich, et al, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.1984
25.07.1984
ADMISSIBLE Rösle Metallwarenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 226 D-8952 Marktoberdorf / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | 08.10.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.02.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.01.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.02.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1986/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1509065 [ ]; | [A]DE1049563 ; | US1526825 [ ] (BOHNSACK JOHN H); | DE1609942 [ ] (DEUTSCHE STEINZEUG); | DE7806748U [ ] |