EP0034843 - Line interruption arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1985 [1985/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janssen, Daniel Johannes Gerardus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 Nl-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | de Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | De Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200116.2 | 02.02.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | NL19800001135 | 26.02.1980 Original published format: NL 8001135 | [1981/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034843 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034843 | Date: | 16.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034843 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/31 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/312 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Unterbrechen der Leitungsschleife | [1981/35] | English: | Line interruption arrangement | [1981/35] | French: | Dispositif de coupure de ligne | [1981/35] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/12] | 30.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2742623 [ ] (DEUTSCHE FERNSPRECHER GMBH) | Examination | FR2266391 | US4008380 | DE2216099 |