EP0036697 - Process of making products consisting of foamed and/or cross-linked synthetic polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1985 [1985/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1981/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brasz, Albert Johan Herman Wieenbroek 6 NL-6121 HE Born / NL | 02 /
Wallink, Hermanus Antonius Im Langenthal 11 D-5135 Selfkant / DE | [1981/39] | Representative(s) | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200315.0 | 21.03.1981 | [1981/39] | Priority number, date | NL19800001732 | 25.03.1980 Original published format: NL 8001732 | [1981/39] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036697 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036697 | Date: | 06.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B29D27/02, B29F3/02 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
B29C44/3442 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/67 (EP,US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Formkörpern aus geschäumten und/oder vernetzten Kunststoffen | [1981/39] | English: | Process of making products consisting of foamed and/or cross-linked synthetic polymers | [1981/39] | French: | Procédé pour produire des produits en matières synthétiques expansés et/ou réticulés | [1981/39] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 10.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3344215 [ ] (DE WITZ GERALD C, et al); | US3719351 [ ] (UPMEIER H); | US3721427 [ ] (UPMEIER H); | US3787542 [ ] (GALLAGHER B, et al); | US3788614 [ ] (GREGORY R); | FR2256825 [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | GB1485500 [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | NL7702020 [ ] (JAN FLORIS INGEN HOUSZ); | FR2381610 [ ] (INGEN HOUSZ JAN [NL]); | US4169679 [ ] (BURNETT ARCHIBALD L [US], et al); | US4181647 [ ] (BEACH SHIRLEY [CA]); | US4218146 [ ] (HOUSZ JAN F INGEN [NL]) |