EP0037609 - Impact resistant polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/41] | Polymer composition | ||
[1984/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1981/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schepers, Herman Augustinus J. Leenstraat 33 NL-6171 LC Stein / NL | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Octrooibureau DSM P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | Hatzmann, Marinus Jan, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM P.O.Box 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200356.4 | 31.03.1981 | [1981/41] | Priority number, date | NL19800002022 | 04.04.1980 Original published format: NL 8002022 | NL19800004377 | 30.07.1980 Original published format: NL 8004377 | [1981/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037609 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037609 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/12, C08L33/18 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L25/16 (EP,US);
C08L33/20 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08L23/286 (EP,US);
Y10S260/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L25/16, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L33/20, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/41] | Title | German: | Schlagfeste Polymerzusammensetzung | [1984/24] | English: | Impact resistant polymer composition | [1984/24] | French: | Composition polymère résistante au choc | [1984/24] |
Former [1981/41] | Polymerzusammensetzung | ||
Former [1981/41] | Polymer composition | ||
Former [1981/41] | Composition polymère | Examination procedure | 08.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/51] | 08.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 09.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.1984 | SE | 13.06.1984 | [1986/12] |
Former [1985/25] | AT | 13.06.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP48044933B ; | US3658950 [ ] (EUSEBI ELIO); | [XD]DE2235052 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | FR2197029 [ ] (DART IND INC [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, 1974, page 93, no. 154021s Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. & JP - B - 48044933 (SHOWA DENKO K.K.) 27-12-1973, & JP48044933B B 00000000 |