EP0042651 - A device for folding and making a hem on the end edges of a piece of cloth e.g a sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/52] | A method for folding and making a hem on the end edges of a piece of cloth e.g a sheet, and a device for accomplishing the method | ||
[1984/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1985 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1985 [1985/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKAB OF SWEDEN AB Box 66041 S-500 06 Boräs / SE | [1981/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gustavsson, Pertti O. Kulla Storegärd 1 Istorp S-510 10 Horred / SE | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al GÖTEBORGS PATENTBYRA AB Box 5005 S-402 21 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 81200680.7 | 17.06.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | SE19800004598 | 23.06.1980 Original published format: SE 8004598 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042651 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042651 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/24, D05B35/02 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
A41D27/24 (EP);
D05B35/08 (EP);
D05D2207/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1981/52] | Title | German: | Maschine zur Herstellung eines Saumes an den Endkanten einer Gewebebahn, z.B. eines Bettuches | [1984/39] | English: | A device for folding and making a hem on the end edges of a piece of cloth e.g a sheet | [1984/39] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication d'un ourlet sur les bords d'extrémité d'une pièce de tissu, par exemple un drap de lit | [1984/39] |
Former [1981/52] | Falt- und Herstellungsverfahren eines Saumes an den Endkanten einer Gewebebahn, z.B. eines Bogens, und Maschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | ||
Former [1981/52] | A method for folding and making a hem on the end edges of a piece of cloth e.g a sheet, and a device for accomplishing the method | ||
Former [1981/52] | Procédé de pliage et fabrication d'un ourlet sur les bords d'extrémité d'une pièce de tissu, par exemple une feuille ainsi que le dispositif de réalisation dudit procédé | Examination procedure | 07.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 25.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2138492 [ ] (HINMAN GEORGE L); | US2738746 [ ] (MACISAAC JR JOHN T, et al); | US3244343 [ ] (MARTIN FRANK G); | GB1249902 [ ] (JENKINS KENNETH THOMAS); | DE2130885 [ ] (TEXMATO GES FUER AUTOMATISIERU); | FR2238005 [ ] (SOUTHERN MACHINERY CO [US]); | FR2354076 [ ] (MIRACLE SEAM INC [US]) |