EP0052384 - Disconnectible terminal contact for high current conductors in electrolytic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/21] | Disconnectible terminal contact for high current conductors | ||
[1987/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1988 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lohrberg, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Breslauer Strasse 1 D-6056 Heustenstamm / DE | [1982/21] | Representative(s) | Rieger, Harald (DE) Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1986/28] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1982/21] | Fischer, Ernst, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 81201063.5 | 25.09.1981 | [1982/21] | Priority number, date | DE19803043207 | 15.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3043207 | [1982/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052384 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052384 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/26 | [1982/21] | CPC: |
H01R4/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/14] |
Former [1982/21] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Lösbarer Anschlusskontakt für Hochstromleiter in Elektrolysevorrichtungen | [1987/14] | English: | Disconnectible terminal contact for high current conductors in electrolytic apparatus | [1987/14] | French: | Contact de raccordement déconnectable pour conducteurs à courants forts dans des dispositifs d'électrolyse | [1987/14] |
Former [1982/21] | Lösbarer Anschlusskontakt für Hochstromleiter | ||
Former [1982/21] | Disconnectible terminal contact for high current conductors | ||
Former [1982/21] | Contact de raccordement déconnectable pour conducteurs à courants forts | Examination procedure | 24.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 16.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1592045 [ ] (UHDE GMBH FRIEDRICH); | DE2330371 [ ] (LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO); | CH470062 [ ] (ALUSUISSE [CH]); | GB689182 [ ] (BERNARD WILLIAM EDMUND WEBBER); | FR2188328 [ ] (LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO [US]); | GB1168298 [ ] (UHDE GMBH FRIEDRICH [DE]); | DE2151683 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) |