EP0054329 - Echo canceller for telephonic transmission by digital channels using a pseudo-logarithmic coding law [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88, rue Brillat Savarin 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | For all designated states TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88, rue Brillat Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lassaux, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1982/25] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1982/25] | Tissot, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81201353.0 | 11.12.1981 | [1982/25] | Priority number, date | FR19800026808 | 17.12.1980 Original published format: FR 8026808 | [1982/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054329 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054329 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/23 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
H04B3/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/25] | Title | German: | Echokompensator für die Fernsprechübertragung mittels digitaler Strecken, welche ein pseudo-logarithmisches Codierungsgesetz verwenden | [1982/25] | English: | Echo canceller for telephonic transmission by digital channels using a pseudo-logarithmic coding law | [1982/25] | French: | Annuleur d'écho pour transmission téléphonique par voies numériques mettant en oeuvre une loi de codage pseudo-logarithmique | [1982/25] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 31.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4064379 [ ] (HORNA OTAKAR ANTHONY) | [ ] - National Telecommunications Conference 1980, Conference Record, Vol. 3, (Conference Tenue du 30 Novembre au 4 Decembre 1980) New York (US) E. McDEVITT: "A Microprocessor Based Adaptive Digital Echo Canceller", pages 56.4.1 - 56.4.4 * page 56.4.1, colonne de droite, lignes 24-27; page 56.4.2, colonne de gauche, dernier alinea a colonne de droite, ligne 8 et lignes 22-26; page 56.4.3, colonne de droite, lignes 7-38; page 56.4.4, colonne de gauche, lignes 13-15 * | Examination | - IEEE TRANS ON COMMUNICATIONS, Vol. COM-26, No. 5, May 1978 D.L. DUTTWEILER: "A twelve- Channel Digital Echo Canceller", pp. 647-653 |