EP0081609 - Suspended roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1986 [1986/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lagendijk, Johannes Octant 197 Sterrenberg NL-3328 SL Dordrecht / NL | [1983/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | van der Beek, George Frans, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 81201358.9 | 10.12.1981 | [1983/25] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081609 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081609 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E04B7/14, E04H15/00 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
E04B7/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/25] | E04B7/14, E04B1/347 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1983/25] | Title | German: | Aufgehängtes Dach | [1983/25] | English: | Suspended roof | [1983/25] | French: | Toiture suspendue | [1983/25] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 18.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2677384 ; | [A]FR2070983 ; | [A]US3153302 ; | [A]US3950901 ; | [A]US3914077 ; | [A]US3465764 | [A] - DBZ DEUTSCHE BAUZEITSCHRIFT.- Bertelsmann Fachverlag - Gütersloh, vol. 10, no. 5, May 1962, pages 725-728; |