EP0035327 - Improvements in or relating to railway disc brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ottewell, Gerlad Allan 16 Newfield Close Solihull West Midlands / GB | [1981/36] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Ronald Duncan Innes, et al A.A.Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WCIV 7LE / GB | [1981/36] | Application number, filing date | 81300495.9 | 05.02.1981 | [1981/36] | Priority number, date | GB19800007267 | 04.03.1980 Original published format: GB 8007267 | [1981/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035327 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035327 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/02 | [1981/36] | CPC: |
F16D65/092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1981/36] | Title | German: | Scheibenbremsen für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1981/36] | English: | Improvements in or relating to railway disc brakes | [1981/36] | French: | Freins à disque pour véhicules ferroviaires | [1981/36] | File destroyed: | 05.09.1996 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/48] | 08.09.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2036107 [ ] | Examination | GB1345174 | GB1527135 |