EP0034936 - Apparatus for controlling fluid flow at an orifice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/35] | Method and apparatus for controlling fluid flow at an orifice | ||
[1984/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1985 [1985/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 North West Boulevard Elkhart Indiana 46514-1899 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 North West Boulevard Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lloyd, Charles F. 231 Elmhurst Drive Rexdale Ontario / CA | 02 /
Zalewski, Z. Leo R.R. 8 Brampton Ontario / CA | 03 /
Brendle, Paul C. 3501 Glen Erin Drive Apt. 1112 Mississauga Ontario L5L 2E9 / CA | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | Amann, Hannes Gerhart H.G. Amann and Company 27 Hillersdon Avenue London, SW13 0EG / GB | [1981/35] | Application number, filing date | 81300737.4 | 23.02.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | CA19800346476 | 26.02.1980 Original published format: CA 346476 | [1981/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034936 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034936 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F02M17/38, F02M7/12, F02M7/24, F02M23/04 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
F02D41/26 (EP);
F02D41/1484 (EP);
F02M3/09 (EP);
F02M7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1981/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Steuerung des Durchflusses durch eine Öffnung | [1984/21] | English: | Apparatus for controlling fluid flow at an orifice | [1984/21] | French: | Dispositif de commande de l'écoulement d'un fluide par un orifice | [1984/21] |
Former [1981/35] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Steuerung des Durchflusses durch eine Öffnung | ||
Former [1981/35] | Method and apparatus for controlling fluid flow at an orifice | ||
Former [1981/35] | Procédé et dispositif de commande de l'écoulement d'un fluide par un orifice | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/45] | 18.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP53070225 [ ]; | [A]US4129105 (ITO OSAMU, et al); | [A]US4132199 (KUROIWA HIROSHI, et al); | DE2813752 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | [A]EP0006770 (SIBE [FR]); | [P]DE2942837 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [P]DE3017467 (NISSAN MOTOR) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 1, No. 105, 16 September 1977 page 3071M78 & JP-A-53 070225, & JP53070225 A 19770916 | [A] - Automobiltechnische Zeitschrift, Vol. 80, No. 9, September 1978, Stuttgart, G. HARTEL "Vergaser mit Elektronischem Regeleingriff" page 400 | Examination | FR2392242 | FR2424417 |