EP0036272 - Permanent dental restorative compositions and methods of using them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1986 [1986/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fellman, Robert Paul 115 Hilltop Court Langhorne Pennsylvania 19047 / US | 02 /
Myers, Robert Marshall 3139 Sheffield Place Holland Pennsylvania 18966 / US | 03 /
Hurwitz, Marvin Joseph 8267 Thompson Road Elkins Park Pennsylvania 19117 / US | 04 /
Slack, Gerald Frederick Ridge Road - R.D. No. 6 Vincentown New Jersey 08088 / US | [1981/38] | Representative(s) | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300921.4 | 05.03.1981 | [1981/38] | Priority number, date | US19800128010 | 07.03.1980 Original published format: US 128010 | [1981/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0036272 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0036272 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036272 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/08 | [1981/38] | CPC: |
A61K6/887 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/38] | Title | German: | Dauerhafte Zahnrestaurationspräparate und Verfahren zu deren Anwendung | [1981/38] | English: | Permanent dental restorative compositions and methods of using them | [1981/38] | French: | Compositions dentaires restauratrices permanentes et méthodes pour leur utilisation | [1981/38] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/15] | 08.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB982814 [ ] (KULZER & CO GMBH); | DE1544925 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE1933917 [ ] (ORTHO INTERNAT SERVICES INC); | US3625916 [ ] (NEWMAN GEORGE V) | Examination | - Ullmanns Encyklopädie, Vol. 10, pp. 8-9 (1975), 4th Ed. |