EP0037182 - Preparation of a dried transition metal product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1991 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1981/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cadlin, John Paton 2 Arundel Close Aston, Nr. Stevenage Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Caunt, Anthony David 1 Templewood Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire / GB | 03 /
Kelland, John William 108 Lalleford Road Stopsley Luton Bedfordshire / GB | 04 /
Law, Peter Leslie The Rookery Tunwells Lane Great Shelford Cambrigde Cambrigdeshire / GB | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Jonathan Winstanley, et al Uniqema Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Roberts, Jonathan Winstanley, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
Former [1989/20] | Locke, Timothy John ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1981/40] | James, David Gomer Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Po Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300930.5 | 05.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | GB19800009838 | 24.03.1980 Original published format: GB 8009838 | GB19810005020 | 18.02.1981 Original published format: GB 8105020 | [1981/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037182 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037182 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0037182 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/62, C08F4/64, C08F2/34 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
Y10S526/903 (EP,US);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/651 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/24, C08F2500/12 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/40] | Title | German: | Herstellung eines getrockneten Übergangsmetallproduktes | [1981/40] | English: | Preparation of a dried transition metal product | [1981/40] | French: | Préparation d'un produit séché à base d'un métal de transition | [1981/40] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/17] | 28.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1987
20.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE DSM Research B.V. NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R. DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1987
20.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE DSM Research B.V. NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | 20.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.01.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 10.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.07.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.04.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1146287 [ ]; | GB1248953 [ ] (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [AD]GB1527736 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [AD]GB1554574 (ICI LTD); | [P]EP0020818 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |