EP0037710 - Thiazole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1985 [1985/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN WYETH & BROTHER LIMITED Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states JOHN WYETH & BROTHER LIMITED Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavalla, John Frederick 105 The Grove Isleworth Middlesex / GB | 02 /
Franklin, Richard Arthur 17 Chaseside Avenue Twyford Reading Berkshire / GB | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Wileman, David Francis, et al C/o John Wyeth and Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | Wileman, David Francis, et al c/o John Wyeth and Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301428.9 | 02.04.1981 | [1981/41] | Priority number, date | GB19800011251 | 03.04.1980 Original published format: GB 8011251 | GB19800013860 | 26.04.1980 Original published format: GB 8013860 | [1981/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037710 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037710 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/30, A61K31/425 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
C07D277/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, NL, SE [1981/41] | Title | German: | Thiazol-Derivate | [1981/41] | English: | Thiazole derivatives | [1981/41] | French: | Dérivés du thiazole | [1981/41] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 15.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3539585 [ ] (SULKOWSKI THEODORE S, et al) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 89, No. 17, October 23, 1978 page 12, Abstract 140156t Columbus. Ohio, USA PEDRAZZINI S. "Epicutaneous Absorption of Fentiazac" & Boll. Chim. Farm. 1978, 117(1) 19-36. * whole Abstract * | [ ] - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, Vol. 17, No. 11, November 1974, K. BROWN et al. "Nonsteroidal Antiinflammatory Agents 1,2,4-Diphenylthiazole-5 Acetic Acid and Related Compounds", pages 1177-1181. * pages 1178-1180 * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 93, No. 19, November 10, 1980 page 12, Abstract 179303w Columbus, Ohio, USA S. FUMERO et al. "Metabolism of Fentiazac" & Arzneim.-Forsch. 1980, 30(8) 1253-6 * whole Abstract * | Examination | FR950290 | FR6190M | GB1137529 | GB1145884 | FR1561433 | GB1262292 | FR2096994 | FR2146575 | GB1574583 |