EP0038186 - Perfluoroamides of diaryl esters of N-phosphonomethylglycinonitrile, herbicidal compositions and herbicidal use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard 40E St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dutra, Gerard Anthony 6 Oak Bend Drive Ladue Missouri 63124 / US | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | Nash, Brian Walter, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | Nash, Brian Walter, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 81301571.6 | 10.04.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | US19800140286 | 14.04.1980 Original published format: US 140286 | [1981/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0038186 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0038186 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038186 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, A01N57/22 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
A01N57/22 (EP);
C07F9/28 (KR);
C07F9/4006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/42] | Title | German: | Perfluoramide von Diarylestern von N-Phosphonomethylglycinonitril, herbizide Zusammensetzungen und herbizide Verwendung davon | [1981/42] | English: | Perfluoroamides of diaryl esters of N-phosphonomethylglycinonitrile, herbicidal compositions and herbicidal use thereof | [1981/42] | French: | Perfluoroamides de diaryl esters du N-phosphonométhylglycinonitrile, compositions herbicides et leur utilisation herbicide | [1981/42] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/17] | 14.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]US3970695 (RUEPPEL MELVIN L); | [D]US4008296 (BARTON JOHN EDWARD DUNCAN); | [D]US4067719 (DUTRA GERARD A) |