EP0038201 - Motorised two-wheeled vehicles with supercharger apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 27-8, Jingumae, 6-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150 / JP | [1981/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Kazuo 3-6-1, Takanodai Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsuda, Minoru B-606 Tsutsujigaoka Haimu 2-13-3, Shibazaki Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shinozaki, Takeshi 1043-178, Oaza Shimotomi Tokorozawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | MacFarlane, John Anthony Ch., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | MacFarlane, John Anthony Christopher, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301609.4 | 13.04.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | JP19800048589 | 15.04.1980 Original published format: JP 4858980 | JP19800049578 | 17.04.1980 Original published format: JP 4957880 | [1981/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0038201 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0038201 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038201 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B62K11/04 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
B62M7/02 (EP,US);
F02B61/02 (EP,US);
F02B75/20 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/03] |
Former [1981/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Motorisierte Zweiradfahrzeuge mit Kompressorgerät | [1981/42] | English: | Motorised two-wheeled vehicles with supercharger apparatus | [1981/42] | French: | Véhicules motorisés à deux roues munis d'un appareil surcompresseur | [1981/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | 21.10.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/35] | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE407141 [ ] (MAX VOLLMAR); | US3027706 [ ] (SPRICK WILLIAM L); | EP0039182 [ ] (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |