EP0056178 - Electrode for living bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/29] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uehara, Masaru 2597-306, Oaza-Honjo Komaki City Aichi / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Teruyoshi 45, Aza-Kobayashi Oaza-Obata Moriyama-ku Nagoya City / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Hirotaka 1204, Tamano-cho Kasugai City Aichi / JP | [1982/29] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | [1982/29] | Application number, filing date | 81301723.3 | 16.04.1981 | [1982/29] | Priority number, date | JP19810002868 | 12.01.1981 Original published format: JP 286881 | [1982/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056178 | Date: | 21.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056178 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/28, A61B5/14 | [1982/29] | CPC: |
A61B5/14542 (EP);
A61B5/1473 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/29] | Title | German: | Elektrode für lebende Körper | [1982/29] | English: | Electrode for living bodies | [1982/29] | French: | Electrode pour corps vivants | [1982/29] | File destroyed: | 15.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 24.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 03.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE7413253U ; | [Y]GB2021784 ; | [Y]FR2325930 ; | [Y]FR2215872 ; | [AD]US3957613 ; | [AD]US3912614 |