EP0039225 - A coated, biaxially oriented polyester film and process for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN HOECHST CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | [1981/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cross, Virginia R. 3419 Ledgestone Drive Houston Texas 77059 / US | [1981/44] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1981/44] | Wardrope, Alexander James Brownlie / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301833.0 | 24.04.1981 | [1981/44] | Priority number, date | US19800143587 | 25.04.1980 Original published format: US 143587 | [1981/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039225 | Date: | 04.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04 | [1981/44] | CPC: |
C08J7/0427 (EP);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP);
C08J2421/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1981/44] | Title | German: | Beschichtete, biaxial orientierte Polyesterfolie und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1981/44] | English: | A coated, biaxially oriented polyester film and process for the production thereof | [1981/44] | French: | Feuille de polyester revêtue, biaxialement orientée et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1981/44] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/04] | 05.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/21] | 01.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1984/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB812470 [ ] (DU PONT); | GB1264338 [ ]; | [D]US3986997 (CLARK HAROLD A); | [AP]WO8000969 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |