EP0040045 - Read-only memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Tsuyoshi Sunny Minami 4-jyo mansion 804 Minami 4-jyo nishi 11-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 064 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Hitoshi 3-21-102, Susukino 3-chome Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | Sunderland, James Harry, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302007.0 | 07.05.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | JP19800061030 | 08.05.1980 Original published format: JP 6103080 | [1981/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040045 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040045 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/00 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
G11C17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/11] |
Former [1982/06] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [1981/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Festwertspeicheranlage | [1981/46] | English: | Read-only memory device | [1981/46] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire morte | [1981/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LU, SE | 19.11.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 29.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 08.06.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 08.06.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 08.06.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 08.06.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 08.06.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 22, No. 8B, January 1980, New York, US WILLIAMS & WU: "Read-Only Storage Data Inversion for Speed Enhancement" pages 3793-3794 * complete article * | Examination | GB1340220 | US4192014 |