EP0040074 - N-substituted aporphines, a method of inducing emesis and a method of controlling psychosis utilising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY 360 Huntington Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY 360 Huntington Avenue Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | ||
Former [1981/46] | For all designated states ARTHUR D. LITTLE, INC. 20 Acorn Park Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140-2390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumeyer, John L. 1 Holiday Road Wayland Massachusetts 01778 / US | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302069.0 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | US19800147737 | 08.05.1980 Original published format: US 147737 | US19800148179 | 08.05.1980 Original published format: US 148179 | [1981/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040074 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040074 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/18, A61K31/485 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
C07D221/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/46] | Title | German: | N-Substituierte Aporphine und ihre Verwendung in einem Verfahren zur Bewirkung von Brechreizen, beziehungsweise Beherrschung von Psychosen | [1981/46] | English: | N-substituted aporphines, a method of inducing emesis and a method of controlling psychosis utilising the same | [1981/46] | French: | Aporphines substituées sur l'atome d'azote, et leur utilisation dans une méthode d'induction de vomissements et de maîtrise d'états de psychoses | [1981/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 08.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3717643 [ ]; | DE2758954 [ ]; | DE2755511 [ ] | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, 9th Collective Subject Index, published in 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA page 13726CS, left-hand column, at the bottom, Abstract 78 92509j & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 78, 1973, Abstract 92509j S. LAL et al. "Effects of Aporphine and Emetine Alkaloids on Centre Dopaminergic Mechanism in Rats" & Eur. J. Pharmac. 1972, 20(1) 71-9. * whole Abstract * | [ ] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, Vol. 42, No. 11, 1977 Columbus, Ohio, USA F.E. GRANCHELLI et al. "Aporphines 23. Normorphothebaine Derivatives: Synthesis of an Aporphine Nitrogen Mustard". pages 2014-17 * whole article * | [ ] - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, Vol. 23, No. 6, June 1980, Columbus, Ohio, USA J.L. NEUMEYER et al. "Aporphines 30", pages 594-95 * complete articele * | [ ] - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, Vol. 23, No. 9, September 1980, Columbus, Ohio, USA J.L. NEUMEYER et al. "Aporphines 31", pages 1008-1013. * complete document * |