EP0041781 - Intrusion detection and alarm system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENTEX CORPORATION 10985, Chicago Drive Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/50] | For all designated states GENTEX CORPORATION 10985, Chicago Drive Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, William E. 337 Stone Harbor Drive Holland Michigan 49423 / US | 02 /
Zachev, Ivan 4859 Elmwood Muskegon Michigan 49441 / US | [1981/50] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1981/50] | Application number, filing date | 81302150.8 | 14.05.1981 | [1981/50] | Priority number, date | US19800158619 | 11.06.1980 Original published format: US 158619 | [1981/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0041781 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0041781 | Date: | 14.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/26 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
G08B13/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/50] | Title | German: | Intrusionsschutz-Detektor und Alarmsystem | [1981/50] | English: | Intrusion detection and alarm system | [1981/50] | French: | Détection d'intrusion et système d'alarme | [1981/50] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 26.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/16] | 10.10.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4091371 [ ] (MASON JR STANLEY I, et al); | US4176348 [ ] (GAY LESLIE W [US], et al); | US3623063 [ ] (FONTAINE JOHN V); | US3828335 [ ] (SALMET G); | US3973208 [ ] (DIAMOND DONALD A) |