EP0042675 - Method of mounting a grinding wheel on a spindle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jenkins, Trevor Leslie 32, St. Michael's Crescent Luton Bedfordshire / GB | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81302411.4 | 01.06.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | GB19800020156 | 20.06.1980 Original published format: GB 8020156 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042675 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B24B45/00 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
B24B45/003 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befestigen einer Schleifscheibe auf einer Spindel | [1981/52] | English: | Method of mounting a grinding wheel on a spindle | [1981/52] | French: | Procédé pour fixer une meule sur un arbre | [1981/52] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/13] | 25.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/08] | 21.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3268632 [ ] (EVES ROBERT A); | GB972224 [ ]; | US2804727 [ ] (SCHMIDT WILLIAM D); | US3526063 [ ] (COOK ARNOLD M) |