EP0041814 - Catalyst devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/50] | For all designated states UNITED KINGDOM ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Christopher John 41 Oxford Road Abingdon Oxfordshire / GB | [1981/50] | Representative(s) | Mansell, Keith Rodney Patents Branch United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/50] | Mansell, Keith Rodney Patents Branch United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302425.4 | 02.06.1981 | [1981/50] | Priority number, date | GB19800018652 | 06.06.1980 Original published format: GB 8018652 | [1981/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0041814 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0041814 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041814 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01J15/00, B01J16/00 | [1982/10] | CPC: |
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J12/007 (EP,US);
F01N3/2832 (EP,US);
F01N3/2846 (EP,US);
F01N2330/02 (EP,US);
Y10S261/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/06] | B01J35/04, B01J35/04, B01J16/00 | ||
Former IPC [1981/50] | B01J8/02, B01J35/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/50] | Title | German: | Katalytische Anlage | [1981/50] | English: | Catalyst devices | [1981/50] | French: | Dispositif catalytique | [1981/50] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 21.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US2408164 [ ] (FOSTER ARCH L); | US4017347 [ ] (CLEVELAND JOSEPH J); | GB1491206 [ ] (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | FR2365625 [ ] (GULF RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CO [US]); | FR2375138 [ ] (AZOTE & PROD CHIM [FR]); | GB1531134 [ ] (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | GB2000045 [ ] (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | EP0018511 [ ] (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]) |