EP0041405 - Tubular polymerization reactor, and process for polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraki, Shigemi 11-28 Hirata 6-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Saiji 2-2 Muronoki-machi 1-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1981/49] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1981/49] | Application number, filing date | 81302468.4 | 03.06.1981 | [1981/49] | Priority number, date | JP19800074377 | 04.06.1980 Original published format: JP 7437780 | [1981/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0041405 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0041405 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041405 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/20, C08F10/00, C08F2/34, C08F4/62 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
B01J19/20 (EP,US);
B01F27/1142 (EP,US);
B01F27/72 (EP,US);
B01F27/725 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
Y10S526/901 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/49] | Title | German: | Rohrförmiger Polymerisationsreaktor und Polymerisationsverfahren | [1981/49] | English: | Tubular polymerization reactor, and process for polymerization | [1981/49] | French: | Réacteur tubulaire de polymérisation et procédé de polymérisation | [1981/49] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 29.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1442688 (BAYER AG); | DE1442726 [ ] (INST CHEMIEANLAGEN); | [A]GB2006232 (NAPHTACHIMIE SA); | [D]US4188470 (COLLINA AMILCARE [IT], et al); | [P]EP0024933 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) |