EP0042703 - Self-guiding type medical vascular catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY MONOFILAMENT COMPANY LIMITED 1, Aza Kawara, Showa-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444 / JP | For all designated states Osaka City Government 3-20 Nakanoshima, 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka 530-8201 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states TORAY MONOFILAMENT COMPANY LIMITED 1, Aza Kawara, Showa-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444 / JP | ||
For all designated states OSAKA CITY GOVERNMENT 3-20, Nakanoshima 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP | |||
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states TORAY MONOFILAMENT COMPANY LIMITED 1, Aza Kawara, Showa-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444 / JP | ||
For all designated states OSAKA CITY GOVERNMENT 3-20, Nakanoshima 1-chomne Kita-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Igawa, Keisuke 6-27, Kajita-cho Obu-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Kunio 15, Nakanokiri Choda-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Ryusaku 1-4-19 Nishiyamadai Sayama-cho Minamikawa-chi-gun Osaka / JP | 04 /
Kudo, Hiroaki 227-2, Higashishigigaoka Sango-cho Ikoma-gun Nara-ken / JP | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Ellis, John Clifford H., et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | Ellis, John Clifford Holgate, et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302619.2 | 12.06.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | JP19800083955 | 23.06.1980 Original published format: JP 8395580 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042703 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042703 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
A61M25/0108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/52] | Title | German: | Selbstführender medizinischer Gefässkatheter | [1981/52] | English: | Self-guiding type medical vascular catheter | [1981/52] | French: | Cathéter médical endo-veineux du type auto-guidé | [1981/52] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/27] | 24.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE94003 [ ]; | US2268321 [ ] (FLYNN VINCENT J); | FR1278426 [ ]; | US3434869 [ ] (DAVIDSON JAMES B); | US3687142 [ ] (LEIBINZOHN SAUL); | US3983879 [ ] (TODD DONALD A); | DE2927788 [ ] (WALLACE LTD H G); | [XP]EP0014424 (TORAY MONOFILAMENT CO [JP], et al) |