EP0044138 - Electrical circuit on porcelain coated metal substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1988 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 1600 Dorchester Boulevard West Montreal Quebec H3H 1R1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 1600 Dorchester Boulevard West Montreal Quebec H3H 1R1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaput, Guy John R.R. Nos. 2 Carlton Place Ontario K7C 3P2 / CA | 02 /
Sich, Edward Matthew 1300 Pinecrest Road Apt. 1514 Ottawa Ontario K2C 3M5 / CA | [1982/03] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302626.7 | 12.06.1981 | [1982/03] | Priority number, date | CA19800355876 | 10.07.1980 Original published format: CA 355876 | [1982/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0044138 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0044138 | Date: | 20.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044138 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/44 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
H05K1/053 (EP);
H05K1/0215 (EP);
H05K1/16 (EP);
H05K1/162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/03] | Title | German: | Elektrische Schaltung auf einem Metallträger mit Porzellanüberzug | [1982/03] | English: | Electrical circuit on porcelain coated metal substrate | [1982/03] | French: | Circuit électrique sur un substrat métallique recouvert de porcelaine | [1982/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.05.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 11.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB939394 (ELECTRALAB PRINTED ELECTRONICS); | [Y]FR1584094 ; | [Y]FR2305913 (SMOLKO GENNADY [SU]); | [A]US4074419 (HANNI STEPHEN L, et al); | [A]EP0006810 (MATERIEL TELEPHONIQUE [FR]); | [A]US4188652 (SMOLKO GENNADY G [SU]) | [XP] - RCA REVIEW, vol.42, no.2, June 1981, PRINCETON, N.J. (US) D.P. DORSEY et al.: "The design, construction, and evaluation of a porcelainized-steel-substrate hybrid-circuit module", pages 298-321 |