EP0044617 - Process for the preparation of cardboard of the corrugated type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1985 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. Patents & Licensing Dept. Foro Buonaparte, 31 P.O. Box 10528 I-20121 Milan / IT | For all designated states CARTOPIAVE S.p.A. 52, Via 4 Novembre Susegana (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. Patents & Licensing Dept. Foro Buonaparte, 31 P.O. Box 10528 I-20121 Milan / IT | ||
For all designated states CARTOPIAVE S.p.A. 52, Via 4 Novembre Susegana (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Credali, Lino 22, Via Calari Casalecchio di Reno Bologna / IT | 02 /
Martini, Emilio 82, Via Altopiano Pontecchio Marconi Bologna / IT | 03 /
Lori, Domenico 15, Via Agnelli Ferrara / IT | [1982/04] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302706.7 | 16.06.1981 | [1982/04] | Priority number, date | IT19800023181 | 02.07.1980 Original published format: IT 2318180 | [1982/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0044617 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044617 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/20, B32B27/08 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
B32B3/28 (EP,US);
B31F1/2804 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B32B2262/02 (US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2307/7265 (US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1982/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von gewelltem Karton | [1982/04] | English: | Process for the preparation of cardboard of the corrugated type | [1982/04] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de carton ondulé | [1982/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/39] | 02.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.11.1984 | SE | 17.06.1985 | BE | 30.06.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1991/51] | NL | 28.11.1984 | |
GB | 16.06.1985 | ||
SE | 17.06.1985 | ||
BE | 30.06.1985 | ||
Former [1989/08] | NL | 28.11.1984 | |
GB | 16.06.1985 | ||
SE | 17.06.1985 | ||
Former [1986/20] | NL | 28.11.1984 | |
GB | 16.06.1985 | ||
Former [1986/15] | NL | 28.11.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55044875 ; | [A]US3307994 (SCOTT JR RAYMOND G); | BE734484 [ ]; | GB1481050 [ ] (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [A]GB1501027 (FUKUOKA PAPER CO LTD, et al); | FR2360420 [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | DE2820171 [ ] (MONTEDISON SPA); | [A]GB2004810 (NISSAN MOTOR) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 4, No. 88, June 24, 1980, page (M-17) (570) & JP-A-55 044875 (Fujii) (29-03-1980), & JP55044875 A 00000000 |