EP0043666 - Generation of musical tones from multiplexed serial data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1983 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Wurlitzer Company 403 East Gurler Road DeKalb, Illinois 60115 / US | [1982/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carley, Joseph C. 2045 Rich Road Sycamore Illinois 60178 / US | 02 /
Ippolito, Anthony C. 1515 Huntington Road Dekalb Illinois 60115 / US | [1982/02] | Representative(s) | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302791.9 | 22.06.1981 | [1982/02] | Priority number, date | US19800165773 | 03.07.1980 Original published format: US 165773 | [1982/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043666 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/38, G10H1/18 | [1982/02] | CPC: |
G10H1/38 (EP);
G10H1/182 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1982/02] | Title | German: | Musikton-Generierung aus aufeinanderfolgenden multiplexierten Daten | [1982/02] | English: | Generation of musical tones from multiplexed serial data | [1982/02] | French: | Génération de sons musicaux à partir de données sérielles multiplexées | [1982/02] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/13] | 27.12.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3955460 [ ]; | US3951028 [ ]; | GB2027970 [ ]; | US4208939 [ ] |