EP0043667 - Process for preparing a coffee volatiles concentrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.1985 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaunbrecher, Judith Ann 6249 Kenwood Hills Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45227 / US | 02 /
Crooks, Richard Glen 44T Versailles Cincinnati Ohio 45240 / US | [1982/02] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302792.7 | 22.06.1981 | [1982/02] | Priority number, date | US19800163609 | 27.06.1980 Original published format: US 163609 | US19810274345 | 17.06.1981 Original published format: US 274345 | [1982/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043667 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043667 | Date: | 06.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/48 | [1982/02] | CPC: |
A23F5/486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Konzentrats aus flüchtigen Kaffee-Stoffen | [1982/02] | English: | Process for preparing a coffee volatiles concentrate | [1982/02] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un concentré de matières volatiles de café | [1982/02] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 20.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 21.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3035922 [ ]; | US3554761 [ ]; | US3717472 [ ]; | US4100305 [ ]; | US3997685 [ ]; | FR614919 [ ]; | GB246454 [ ]; | US4100306 [ ]; | FR2340053 [ ]; | FR2218059 [ ]; | US4092436 [ ]; | GB1466881 [ ]; | EP0001850 [ ]; | EP0006646 [ ] |