EP0047057 - Triazole compounds, a process for preparing them, their use as plant fungicides and fungicidal compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1986 [1986/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1982/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Worthington, Paul Anthony 4 Oakhurst Road Maidenhead Court Park Maidenhead Berkshire / GB | 02 /
De Fraine, Paul 77 McCarthy Way Wokingham Berkshire / GB | 03 /
Rathmell, William George 'Culvers' 10 Gypsy Lane Wokingham Berkshire / GB | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Alner, Henry Giveen Hamilton, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents P.O. Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | Alner, Henry Giveen Hamilton, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents P.O. Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303272.9 | 16.07.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | GB19800027558 | 26.08.1980 Original published format: GB 8027558 | GB19800039277 | 08.12.1980 Original published format: GB 8039277 | [1982/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047057 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047057 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047057 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, A01N43/64, C07C29/36, C07D303/28 | [1982/10] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07D303/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | Triazol-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, ihre Verwendung als Pflanzenfungizide und diese enthaltende Zusammenstellungen | [1982/10] | English: | Triazole compounds, a process for preparing them, their use as plant fungicides and fungicidal compositions containing them | [1982/10] | French: | Dérivés du triazole, leur procédé de préparation, leur application comme fongicides pour les plantes et compositions les contenant | [1982/10] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3800044 ; | [X]GB1448437 ; | [X]FR1408958 ; | [P]EP0015756 ; | [A]EP0004315 ; | [A]GB1529818 | Examination | EP0010674 |