EP0045608 - Apparatus for sequential readout [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1982/06] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swab, John Mathew 3036 Walpole Street Baldwinsville New York 13027 / US | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303427.9 | 27.07.1981 | [1982/06] | Priority number, date | US19800175625 | 05.08.1980 Original published format: US 175625 | [1982/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045608 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045608 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045608 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, H01L27/14 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
H01L27/14862 (EP,US);
H04N25/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/06] | Title | German: | Sequentielle Auslesevorrichtung | [1982/06] | English: | Apparatus for sequential readout | [1982/06] | French: | Dispositif de lecture séquentielle | [1982/06] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 08.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3786263 (MICHON G); | [AD]US3935446 (MICHON GERALD J); | [A]US4129887 (MICHON G [US]) |