EP0047082 - Method of production of cladding tube for nuclear fuel element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1985 [1985/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 15, Kitahama 5-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 15, Kitahama 5-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imahashi, Hiromichi 15-22 Tagacho-3-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Kawahara, Akira 546-2 Funaishikawa Tokaimura Naka-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Konishi, Takao 6, Suehirocho-4-chome Nishinomiya-shi / JP | 04 /
Morimoto, Yoshihumi 28-7-206 Koshiencho Nishinomiya-shi / JP | 05 /
Terui, Michio Nippon Mining Ltd. 10-1 Toranomon-2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Yagi, Yoshio Central Laboratory of Nippon Mining Co. Ltd. 17-35 Niizo-Minami-3-chome Toda-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303685.2 | 13.08.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | JP19800111630 | 15.08.1980 Original published format: JP 11163080 | [1982/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047082 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047082 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G21C21/12, B23K20/02 | [1982/10] | CPC: |
B21C37/06 (EP,US);
B23K20/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1984/05] |
Former [1982/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines geschichteten Rohres für ein Kernbrennstoffelement | [1982/10] | English: | Method of production of cladding tube for nuclear fuel element | [1982/10] | French: | Méthode de production de tube plaqué pour élément de combustion nucléaire | [1982/10] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL | 17.02.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 22.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1981 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1981 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB909725 [ ] (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | US3928901 [ ] (SCHILLING WILLIAM F, et al); | US4198740 [ ] (PREVENDER THOMAS S [US]); | FR1288331 [ ] (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | FR2287303 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | DE2164639 [ ] (WILLOW HILL IND INC); | DE451203 [ ] (SILLER & RODENKIRCHEN G M B H) |