EP0047085 - Centrifugal gas-liquid contact apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1988 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1982/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wem, James William 3 Whernside Langdale Marton Middlesbrough Cleveland / GB | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Ieuan, et al Uniqema Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | Thomas, Ieuan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
Former [1982/10] | Virr, Dennis Austin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 1/15 Queens Square Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS2 1AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303692.8 | 13.08.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | GB19800028174 | 01.09.1980 Original published format: GB 8028174 | [1982/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047085 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047085 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047085 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F5/06, B01D53/18, B01J19/18, B01J19/04 | [1982/10] | CPC: |
B01J19/1806 (EP,US);
B01D19/0052 (EP,US);
B01D3/30 (EP,US);
B01F23/23421 (EP,US);
B01J19/006 (EP,US);
B01J19/0066 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00772 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | Zentrifugalapparat zum Gas-Flüssigkeit-Kontakt | [1982/10] | English: | Centrifugal gas-liquid contact apparatus | [1982/10] | French: | Appareil centrifuge pour le contact gaz-liquide | [1982/10] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE193260 ; | [AD]GB757149 (CLAES WILHELM PILO); | [X]US3233880 (PODBIELNIAK WALTER J); | [A]GB1241412 (SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER AB [SE]); | [A]DE2162280 ; | [X]US3809375 (BONNET F); | [A]US4038353 (SHAFRANOVSKY ALEXANDR VLADIMIR, et al); | [YD]EP0002568 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [Y]FR2437856 (MO I KHIM) |