EP0048549 - 3-0-Demethyl derivatives of istamycin B series compounds and their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zaidanhojin Biseibutsu Kagaku Kenkyukai 14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states Zaidanhojin Biseibutsu Kagaku Kenkyukai 14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umezawa, Hamao 23 Toyotama Kita 4-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Shinichi 1157-1 Ichigao-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Okami, Yoshiro 18-14 Denenchofu 4-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Evans, David Charles, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | Evans, David Charles, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303758.7 | 18.08.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | JP19800125334 | 11.09.1980 Original published format: JP 12533480 | [1982/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048549 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048549 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/22, A61K31/70 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
C07H15/224 (EP,US);
C07H15/00 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | 3-O-Demethyl-Derivate von Verbindungen der Istamycin B-Serie und ihre Herstellung | [1982/13] | English: | 3-0-Demethyl derivatives of istamycin B series compounds and their preparation | [1982/13] | French: | Dérivés 3-O-déméthyl de composés de la série de l'istamycine B et leur préparation | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/48] | 05.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2375250 [ ] (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | US4124756 [ ] (MARTIN JERRY R, et al); | FR2439206 [ ] (KOWA CO [JP], et al); | GB2037743 [ ] (KOWA CO); | EP0035337 [ ] (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [ ] - Journal of Antibodies, Vol. 32, No. 9, September 1979, Tokyo (JP) Y. OKAMI: "The Journal of Antibiotics", pages 964-966 * the whole Abstract * | [ ] - Journal of Antibodies, Vol. 33, No. 11, November 1980, Tokyo (JP) DAISHIRO IKEDA et al.: "Synthesis of Demethyl Derivatives of Istamycin A", pages 1281-1288 * pages 1281 and 1282 * | Examination | EP0040764 |