EP0048576 - A barrel assembly for a plating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1986 [1986/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI-KAISHA YAMADA MEKKI KOUGYOUSHO 8-7, chome Chitose Atsuta-ku, Nagoya / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI-KAISHA YAMADA MEKKI KOUGYOUSHO 8-7, chome Chitose Atsuta-ku, Nagoya / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Shizuhiro 4-chome, 54-banchi Hiromi Chiryu-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Barrett, James William, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [1982/13] | Application number, filing date | 81304172.0 | 11.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | JP19800134855 | 22.09.1980 Original published format: JP 13485580 | JP19810079774 | 28.05.1981 Original published format: JP 7977481 | [1982/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048576 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048576 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/20 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
C25D17/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/13] | Title | German: | Galvanisiertrommel | [1982/13] | English: | A barrel assembly for a plating apparatus | [1982/13] | French: | Tonneau de galvanisation | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 12.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1119623 [ ]; | DE882937 [ ]; | US3582492 [ ] |