EP0049578 - Steam Turbine-generator control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.01.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang Yung-Chuan, Eddie 217 Plush Mill Road Wallingford Pennsylvania / US | 02 /
Szabo, Andras Imre 17 Morris Street Export Pennsylvania / US | 03 /
Ottobre, Louis Gennaro 3997 Remaley Road Murrysville Pennsylvania / US | [1982/15] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304252.0 | 16.09.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | US19800191606 | 29.09.1980 Original published format: US 191606 | [1982/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049578 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049578 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049578 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/24, G05B9/03, G05B15/02 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
F01D17/24 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/12] | F01D17/24, G05B9/03, G05B15/02 | ||
Former IPC [1982/15] | G05B15/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/15] | Title | German: | Dampfturbinengenerator-Regelsystem | [1982/15] | English: | Steam Turbine-generator control system | [1982/15] | French: | Système de réglage pour turbine-générateur à vapeur | [1982/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 10.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.1989
02.05.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.1989
02.05.1989
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.1989
02.05.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft, Berlin und München Postfach 22 16 34 D-8000 München / DE | 08.05.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.09.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 12.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.12.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/11] | Appeal following opposition | 10.12.1990 | Appeal received No. T0942/90 | 07.02.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.12.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 03.12.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.1991 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.09.1991 | [2015/21] |
Former [1992/37] | CH | 08.06.1988 | |
LI | 08.06.1988 | ||
BE | 30.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/27] | CH | 08.06.1988 | |
LI | 08.06.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4204258 (HELTSLEY ALAN T [US], et al); | [A]US4220869 (URAM ROBERT [US]); | [A]US4035624 (LARDI FRANCESCO) | [A] - REGELUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS, Vol. 22, No. 3, 1980, Munich W. SENDLER "Eine fehlertolerierende Reglerstation auf der Basis eines busorientierten Multi-Mikrorechner-Systems", pages 73-81 | [A] - REGELUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS, Vol. 22, No. 9, 1980, Munich G. SCHMIDT et al. "Redundanzkonzepte in modernen Proze~automatisierungssystemen", pages 310, 312, 313 |