EP0048181 - Binocular indirect ophthalmoscope with camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.04.1986 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1986 | Refusal of application | published on 28.05.1986 [1986/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fukai, Michael Edwin 1017 South Boulder Road Louisville Colorado 80027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states Fukai, Michael Edwin 1017 South Boulder Road Louisville Colorado 80027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304281.9 | 17.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | US19800187900 | 17.09.1980 Original published format: US 187900 | [1982/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0048181 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0048181 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/14 | [1982/16] | CPC: |
A61B3/14 (EP);
A61B2090/502 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/12] | A61B3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/12] | Title | German: | Binokularer indirekter Augenspiegel mit Kamera | [1982/12] | English: | Binocular indirect ophthalmoscope with camera | [1982/12] | French: | Ophtalmoscope binoculaire indirect à caméra | [1982/12] | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 27.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/22] | 20.12.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1605725 [ ]; | US4018514 [ ]; | US3963329 [ ]; | US2990765 [ ] |