EP0049079 - Method for rolling plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/14] | Method and apparatus for rolling plate | ||
[1985/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hume, Kenneth Michael 8, Lister Street East Kew Victoria / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1982/14] | For all designated states Hume, Kenneth Michael 8, Lister Street East Kew Victoria / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hume, Kenneth Michael 8 Lister Street East Kew Victoria / AU | [1982/14] | Representative(s) | Hind, Raymond Stenton, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Lyon House Lyon Road Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 2ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/14] | Hind, Raymond Stenton, et al c/o MATHISEN, MACARA & Co. European Patent Attorneys Lyon House Lyon Road Harrow Middlesex HA1 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304316.3 | 21.09.1981 | [1982/14] | Priority number, date | AU19800005658 | 19.09.1980 Original published format: AU 565880 | [1982/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0049079 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049079 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/14 | [1982/14] | CPC: |
B21D5/143 (EP,US);
B21D5/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Rundbiegen von Blechen | [1985/02] | English: | Method for rolling plate | [1985/02] | French: | Procédé pour le cintrage de tôle | [1985/02] |
Former [1982/14] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Rundbiegen von Blechen | ||
Former [1982/14] | Method and apparatus for rolling plate | ||
Former [1982/14] | Procédé et appareil pour le cintrage de tôle | Examination procedure | 02.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 01.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.10.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | AU463345 [ ]; | DE618901 [ ] (WILHELM HEINEN); | US2265187 [ ] (MURCH JOHN H); | DE906443 [ ] (ROTHE ERDE EISENWERK); | FR2001975 [ ] (MITSUBISHIKI JUKOGYO); | FR2097182 [ ] (FERRANTI ALBINO); | FR2100162 [ ] (FERRANTI ALBINO); | EP0029345 [ ] (HUME KENNETH MICHAEL) |