EP0048629 - Channel induction furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1988 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ELECTRICITY COUNCIL 30 Millbank PO Box 209 London, SW1P 4RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states THE ELECTRICITY COUNCIL 30 Millbank PO Box 209 London, SW1P 4RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edgerley, Christopher John Brakeley Lodge Little Leigh Northwich Cheshire / GB | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/06] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1982/13] | Rennie, Ian Malcolm BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304380.9 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | GB19800030813 | 24.09.1980 Original published format: GB 8030813 | [1982/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0048629 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0048629 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048629 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/20, F27B14/06 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
H05B6/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | Rinneninduktionsöfen | [1982/13] | English: | Channel induction furnaces | [1982/13] | French: | Four à rigole à induction | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/27] | 25.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB191318073 [ ] (CRAFTS WALTER NATHAN [US]); | US1532090 [ ] (MAGNUS UNGER); | DE745187 [ ] (ANDREAS JOHANSSON); | DE888732 [ ] (EISENWERKE GELSENKIRCHEN AG); | DE1558079 [ ] (RHEINSTAHL HUETTENWERKE AG, et al); | US3595979 [ ] (SHEARMAN WILBUR E); | US4021602 [ ] (DELASSUS JEAN) |