EP0049158 - I/O data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell Bull Inc. 3800 W. 80th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55431 / US | [1987/46] |
Former [1982/14] | For all designated states Honeywell Information Systems Inc. 200 Smith Street Waltham Massachusetts 02154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Kin C. 32 Westwood Street Burlington Massachusetts 01803 / US | 02 /
Goss, Gary J. 93 Harris Street Acton Massachusetts 01720 / US | [1982/14] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Geissler, Bernhard, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/39] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/14] | Harman, Michael Godfrey Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304501.0 | 29.09.1981 | [1982/14] | Priority number, date | US19800192126 | 29.09.1980 Original published format: US 192126 | [1982/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049158 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049158 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049158 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F15/16 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
G06F13/24 (EP);
H04J3/02 (KR);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F13/385 (EP);
G06F15/167 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/14] | G06F3/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/14] | Title | German: | E/A-Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1982/14] | English: | I/O data processing system | [1982/14] | French: | Système de traitement des données entrée/sortie | [1982/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/50] | 18.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4056843 (BISHOP RICHARD L, et al); | [A]US3670306 (FOX DAVID J, et al); | [A]US4184200 (MELBERG ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]EP0010135 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 2, July 1978, pages 786-787, New York, (USA); R.H. BURMESTER et al.: "Interrupt protocol for interconnected microprocessors". | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 1, June 1979, pages 251-254, New York, (USA); P. DZUGAN et al.: "Buffer for asynchronous communication of maintenance logout functions and messages". |