EP0049172 - Gold recovery process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunter, William Prebend House Hunter Street Buckingham, MK18 1DQ / GB | [1982/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/14] | Representative(s) | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/14] | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304538.2 | 01.10.1981 | [1982/14] | Priority number, date | GB19800031562 | 01.10.1980 Original published format: GB 8031562 | GB19810028283 | 18.09.1981 Original published format: GB 8128283 | [1982/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0049172 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049172 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/04, C22B3/00, C01G7/00 | [1982/14] | CPC: |
C01G7/003 (EP);
C22B3/24 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [1982/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Goldgewinnung | [1982/14] | English: | Gold recovery process | [1982/14] | French: | Procédé d'obtention d'or | [1982/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 31.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP56068166 [ ]; | [A]GB191316898 (BAUR EMIL [CH], et al); | [A]US1358096 (OSKAR NAGEL); | US1375441 [ ] (EMILE BAUDIN MARIE LOUIS); | [D]GB1310011 (SECR DEFENCE); | [A]AU475788B ; | [A]FR2222446 (MO [SU]); | [D]GB1376888 (SECR DEFENCE); | [A]US3920403 (ROSS J RICHARD); | [A]US3970737 (DAVIDSON RAYMOND JOHN) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 95, 19th October 1981, page 69, No. 134300t, Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A.; & JP-A-56 068 166 (Nippon Mining Co.) 08-06-1981, & JP56068166 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 94, 23rd February 1981, page 225, No. 50840k, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) N.V. MAKHNYR et al.: "Possible Electrolytic Extraction of Precious Metals from Cyanide Solutions on Carbon-Graphile Materials"; & Gidrometallurgiya Zolota, M. 1980, 169-173 |