EP0050927 - The preparation of beta-lactam antibiotics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/18] | Beta-lactam antibiotics, their preparation and their use | ||
[1985/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1986 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corbett, David Francis 72E Holmesdale Road Reigate Surrey / GB | 02 /
Southgate, Robert 7 Tilletts Lane Warnham West Sussex / GB | 03 /
Coulton, Steven 6 Coatham Place Cranleigh Surrey / GB | [1982/18] | Representative(s) | Hesketh, Alan, et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr., et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304618.2 | 06.10.1981 | [1982/18] | Priority number, date | GB19800034453 | 25.10.1980 Original published format: GB 8034453 | [1982/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050927 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050927 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/40, // (C07D487/04, 209:00, 205:00) | [1982/18] | CPC: |
C07D477/02 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1982/18] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Beta-Lactam-Antibiotika | [1985/13] | English: | The preparation of beta-lactam antibiotics | [1985/13] | French: | La préparation de bêta-lactames antibiotiques | [1985/13] |
Former [1982/18] | Beta-Lactam-Antibiotika, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | ||
Former [1982/18] | Beta-lactam antibiotics, their preparation and their use | ||
Former [1982/18] | Bêta-lactames antibiotiques, leur préparation et leur application | Examination procedure | 25.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 10.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.03.1985 | CH | 31.10.1985 | LI | 31.10.1985 | [1989/20] |
Former [1988/04] | BE | 27.03.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | US4218462 [ ] (CHRISTENSEN BURTON G [US], et al); | EP0001628 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | US4223038 [ ] (SMALE TERENCE C); | EP0001627 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]) |