EP0050453 - An oil-resistant gasket material and packing material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1986 [1986/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumimura, Shin-ichi 6, 1-chome Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Amamiya, Tetsuo 5, 1-chome Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1982/17] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304683.6 | 08.10.1981 | [1982/17] | Priority number, date | JP19800147403 | 21.10.1980 Original published format: JP 14740380 | [1982/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050453 | Date: | 28.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050453 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04 | [1982/17] | CPC: |
C08K5/54 (EP);
C08G77/38 (KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR);
C08L83/08 (EP);
C09K3/10 (KR);
C08G77/16 (EP);
C08G77/18 (EP);
C08G77/20 (EP);
C08G77/24 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/54, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/44 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/44 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/08, C08K5/54 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/17] | Title | German: | Gegen Öl resistente Dichtungs- und Packungsmaterialien | [1982/17] | English: | An oil-resistant gasket material and packing material | [1982/17] | French: | Compositions d'étanchéité résistant à l'huile et matériaux de bourrage | [1982/17] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 25.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE880152 (TORAY SILICONE CO); | [A]GB2029845 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]DE1934356 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH); | [A]DE2335309 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |