EP0052928 - Water-borne surface-coating compositions containing complexed cobalt driers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1985 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1985 [1985/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuodex Inc. Turner Place P.O. Box 365 Piscataway New Jersey 08854 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | For all designated states Nuodex Inc. Turner Place P.O. Box 365 Piscataway New Jersey 08854 / US | ||
Former [1982/22] | For all designated states TENNECO CHEMICALS INC Park 80 Plaza West-1 Saddle Brook, New Jersey 07662 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellettiere, Samuel James 70 Carlton Club Drive Piscataway New Jersey / US | 02 /
Hurley, Raymond 261 Power Street New Brunswick New Jersey / US | 03 /
Hoch, Samuel 1529-56th Street Brooklyn New York / US | [1984/14] |
Former [1982/22] | 01 /
Bellettiere, Samuel James 70 Carlton CLub Drive Piscataway New Jersey / US | ||
02 /
Hurley, Raymond 261 Power Street New Brunswick New Jersey / US | |||
03 /
Hoch, Samuel 1529-56th Street Brooklyn New York / US | Representative(s) | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304708.1 | 09.10.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | US19800205834 | 10.11.1980 Original published format: US 205834 | [1982/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052928 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052928 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09F9/00, C09D5/02 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
C09F9/00 (EP,US);
C09K3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/22] | Title | German: | Komplexe Kobalt-Trockenmittel enthaltende wässrige Anstrichzusammensetzungen | [1982/22] | English: | Water-borne surface-coating compositions containing complexed cobalt driers | [1982/22] | French: | Compositions aqueuses pour revêtement de surfaces contenant un siccatif à base d'un complexe de cobalt | [1982/22] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 18.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2348699 [ ] (MOONEY CHEMICALS); | US4175064 [ ] (BELLETTIERE SAMUEL J [US], et al); | BE653720 [ ]; | GB1236085 [ ] (IMP CHEMICAL IINDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) |