EP0050512 - Method of forming electrical interconnections on contact pads of semi-conductor devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1985 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Young, Miriam F. 277 Fuller Street Dorchester Massachusetts / US | [1982/17] | Representative(s) | Harman, Michael Godfrey Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Harman, Michael Godfrey Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | ||
Former [1982/17] | Riddle, John Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell, Berks. / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304882.4 | 20.10.1981 | [1982/17] | Priority number, date | US19800198319 | 20.10.1980 Original published format: US 198319 | [1982/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050512 | Date: | 28.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050512 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/90, H01L21/58, H01L27/14 | [1982/17] | CPC: |
H01L21/76801 (EP,US);
H01L24/02 (US);
H01L21/76885 (EP,US);
H01L23/147 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L2224/24225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0103 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01052 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01077 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0665 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12033, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1982/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Formen von elektrischen Verbindungen an Kontakflächen von Halbleitervorrichtungen | [1982/17] | English: | Method of forming electrical interconnections on contact pads of semi-conductor devices | [1982/17] | French: | Procédé pour former des interconnextions électriques sur des zones de contact de dispositifs semiconducteurs | [1982/17] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 30.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3965568 [ ] (GOOCH ROLAND W); | US4113578 [ ] (DEL MONTE LOUIS A); | US4196508 [ ] (LORENZE ROBERT V JR [US]); | US4209358 [ ] (DILEO DANIEL A [US], et al) |