EP0051951 - Electrical distribution system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1987 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1987 [1987/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRAK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 45, High Street Kingston-upon-Thames Surrey, KT1 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states ELECTRAK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 45, High Street Kingston-upon-Thames Surrey, KT1 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states ELECTRAK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 45, High Street Kingston-upon-Thames Surrey, KT1 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states ELECTRAK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 45, High Street Kingston-upon-Thames Surrey, KT1 1LQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Humphreys, Michael 135 Cavendish Avenue Ealing London W.13 / GB | 02 /
Rolfe, John Anthony 31 Longbridge Close Tring Hertfordshire / GB | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Richards, David John, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1982/20] | Application number, filing date | 81305042.4 | 26.10.1981 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | GB19800034663 | 28.10.1980 Original published format: GB 8034663 | GB19810020340 | 01.07.1981 Original published format: GB 8120340 | [1982/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0051951 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0051951 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051951 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
H01R25/14 (EP,US);
H01R25/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/20] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Verteilungssystem | [1982/20] | English: | Electrical distribution system | [1982/20] | French: | Système de distribution électrique | [1982/20] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/37] | 02.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]LU41806 ; | [Y]US3209301 (DUFFY JR LEO JEROME); | [Y]FR1564854 ; | [X]FR1569100 ; | [Y]FR2337451 (TECHNILEC SARL [FR]); | [YD]EP0007757 (ELECTRAK INT LTD [GB]) |