EP0055017 - Magnetic bubble memory cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sukeda, Toshiaki 406-3, Hakata-cho Susaka-shi Nogano 382 / JP | 02 /
Naoi, Shiro 3-141, Aza Minamihara Oaza Koyama Suzaka-shi Nagano 382 / JP | 03 /
Maegawa, Harumi 837-7, Shimoaso Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215 / JP | [1987/04] |
Former [1982/28] | 01 /
Sukeda, Toshiaki 406-3, Hakata-cho Susaka-shi Nagano-shi Nagano 380 / JP | ||
02 /
Naoi, Shiro 3-141, Aza Minamihara Oaza Koyama Suzaka-shi Nagano 382 / JP | |||
03 /
Maegawa, Harumi 837-7, Shimoaso Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215 / JP | |||
Former [1982/26] | 01 /
Sukeda, Toshiaki A2-608, Yanagiharadanchi 1424 Oaza Yanagihara Nagano-shi Nagano 380 / JP | ||
02 /
Naoi, Shiro 3-141, Aza Minamihara Oaza Koyama Suzaka-shi Nagano 382 / JP | |||
03 /
Maegawa, Harumi 837-7, Shimoaso Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215 / JP | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305196.8 | 30.10.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | JP19800155135 | 30.10.1980 Original published format: JP 15513580 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055017 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055017 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11C19/08 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
H05K5/026 (EP,US);
G11C19/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/26] | Title | German: | Magnetische Blasenspeicherkassette | [1982/26] | English: | Magnetic bubble memory cassette | [1982/26] | French: | Cassette de mémoire magnétique à bulles | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/10] | 18.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 12.02.1985 | Appeal received No. T0130/85 | 16.04.1985 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.12.1985 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1985/50] | 29.01.1986 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/05] | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4156934 [ ] (BURFORD THOMAS M [US], et al) | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, volume 21, no. 7, December 1978, NEW YORK (US) J.D. LARNERD "Bubble domain package" pages 2714-2715 |