EP0053451 - Contact lens disinfecting and preserving solution (polymeric) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1986 [1986/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED 1400 North Goodman Street Rochester, NY 14602 / US | [1982/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Francis Xavier 67 Falstaff Road Rochester New York 14609 / US | 02 /
Riedhammer, Thomas Martin 52 Appian Drive Rochester New York 14606 / US | [1982/23] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305450.9 | 18.11.1981 | [1982/23] | Priority number, date | US19800210960 | 28.11.1980 Original published format: US 210960 | [1982/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0053451 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0053451 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053451 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, A01N33/12, G02C13/00, G02C7/04 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
A01N33/12 (EP,US);
A61L12/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/23] | Title | German: | Lösung (polymerisch) zum Desinfektieren und Konservieren von Kontaktlinsen | [1982/23] | English: | Contact lens disinfecting and preserving solution (polymeric) | [1982/23] | French: | Solution(polymérique) pour la désinfection et la conservation de lentilles de contact | [1982/23] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/46] | 06.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2438035 (ICI LTD); | [Y]US4046706 (KREZANOSKI JOSEPH ZENON); | [YD]GB2027040 (SMITH & NEPHEW PHARMA) | Examination | US3288770 |