EP0053894 - Cycle wheel rotation detector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimano Industrial Company Limited 77, Oimatsu-cho, 3-chome, Sakai-shi Osaka 570-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL COMPANY LIMITED 77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimano, Keizo 81, 3-cho, Midorigaoka-Minamimachi Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | [1982/24] | Representative(s) | Szczuka, Jan Tymoteusz, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | Szczuka, Jan Tymoteusz, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305565.4 | 25.11.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | JP19800171527U | 29.11.1980 Original published format: JP 17152780 U | [1982/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053894 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053894 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/487 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
G01P3/484 (EP,US);
G01P3/443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1982/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Feststellen der Drehung eines Rades bei einem Fahrrad | [1982/24] | English: | Cycle wheel rotation detector device | [1982/24] | French: | Dispositif détecteur de rotation pour une roue de bicyclette | [1982/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/32] | 27.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.11.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/26] | GB | 25.11.1985 | |
SE | 26.11.1985 | ||
Former [1989/08] | SE | 26.11.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | CH551625 [ ] (KOCH AUTO AG); | GB2034047 [ ] (JIDOSHA DENKI KOGYO KK); | GB211086 [ ] (ARTHUR MACDONALD COX) |